U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00289-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foreman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • May 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Vacate (2255) ]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 15, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 15, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 13, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 13, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 10, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • August 05, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • July 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • June 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • May 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 02, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 30, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Seal ]
  • March 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 22, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 07, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • February 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 03, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • January 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • December 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • November 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 19, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 14, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 14, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 23, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 11, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 09, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Motion Referred]
July, 2021
  • July 31, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 31, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • July 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Discovery ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 29, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 15, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 15, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.