U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Munoz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Proposed Order]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Deferral of Prosecution]
  • January 11, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 10, 2022: [Deferral of Prosecution]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 15, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • July 15, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.