U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boring
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 22, 2021: [Remark]
  • July 22, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.