U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STEELE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervision]
  • September 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [SEALED USPO Response - Defendant Motion for Early Term]
  • September 08, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 30, 2022: [Early Termination of Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.