U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order/Writ on Motion for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • July 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 21, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 16, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.