U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00291-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Covington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 18, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 06, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 06, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 25, 2021: [Expedite ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 20, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 20, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.