U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SAWYERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Supervision]
  • August 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED USPO Response - Defendant Motion for Early Term]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 10, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 08, 2022: [Early Termination of Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.