U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grunwaldt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [JERS Exhibits]
  • February 15, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • February 14, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • February 14, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 14, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 13, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 11, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 10, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 04, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 04, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 01, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 26, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence - Government]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 21, 2022: [Request for Notice of Alibi/Insanity Defense]
  • January 21, 2022: [Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • July 26, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 22, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.