U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [USDOJ Return of Service]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 17, 2022: [Seal]
  • July 17, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 13, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Service by Publication]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [USDOJ Return of Service]
  • November 24, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 24, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 24, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • November 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.