U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 03, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • July 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.