U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 16, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Waiver]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 15, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 15, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest]
  • November 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.