U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Banner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Service by Publication]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 06, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 17, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 13, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.