U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Prob - Order Regarding Travel]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 14, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • July 26, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.