U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Broyles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 04, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2021: [Factual Basis]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • July 27, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 22, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.