U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barrios
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 15, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 15, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 15, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.