U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grandy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 11, 2022: [Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • July 28, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 24, 2022: [Suppress]
  • May 23, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • May 19, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 03, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • March 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 26, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Discovery]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.