U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kester
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 04, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 04, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.