U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Alcocer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 26, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 25, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.