U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morales et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time re: Other]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 06, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 06, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 30, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 10, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 02, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 04, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 29, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.