U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00185-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Linares-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Expedite]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 07, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 12, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 12, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.