U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00184-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vongphakdy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • October 19, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 04, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Revoke]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 16, 2022: [Transcript - Voir Dire]
  • August 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 04, 2022: [JERS Exhibits]
  • May 04, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 04, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Returning Trial Exhibits]
  • May 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 02, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 02, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 27, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 25, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [In Limine]
  • April 18, 2022: [Produce]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2022: [Request for Notice of Alibi/Insanity Defense]
  • April 07, 2022: [Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 21, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 13, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 13, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.