U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00181-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holmes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2022: [Bond]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Arrest]
  • September 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • August 19, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 17, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Seal]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 04, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • July 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.