U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morocho-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2022: [Seal Document]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • June 20, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 17, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 17, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2022: [Factual Basis]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 21, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 21, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.