U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00292-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Docket Call]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 18, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.