U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lacy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 28, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Release Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • July 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.