U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00296-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tripp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss ]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • November 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Seal ]
  • October 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • September 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 15, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 07, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • September 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.