U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00295-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Michael
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing ]
  • October 12, 2021: [SEALED Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.