U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00294-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gower
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 14, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 03, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
  • December 13, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 13, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Document]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • September 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Bond Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Government Brief]
  • July 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.