U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenrette et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 24, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Seal ]
  • September 22, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Competency Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 09, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 06, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Examination]
  • December 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 01, 2021: [Psychiatric Examination]
  • December 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Text Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.