U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berroa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • December 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 11, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.