U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:03-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Addendum To Violation Report (PostTrial)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [Arrest]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
  • July 22, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.