U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hackworth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • March 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Bond ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • July 22, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • July 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.