U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00243-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPARKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of Prob/SR]
  • June 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice-Other]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • April 12, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 05, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 05, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • April 05, 2022: [Arrest]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • February 23, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.