U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00179-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jefferson, et. al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue Other]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 15, 2022: [Factual Basis]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue Other]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Indictment]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • August 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 29, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 26, 2021: [Bond]
  • July 26, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 26, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • July 26, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.