U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 17, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2022: [SEALED Document]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 15, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [SEALED Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 16, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.