U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AROCHE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • December 09, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 27, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
  • May 03, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • May 02, 2022: [USPO PROB 12A - Report of Offender]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 19, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 15, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 29, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.