U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00259-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KRAMER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 21, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 07, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 04, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 19, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.