U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00250-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOCKLEAR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 01, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 14, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 02, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.