U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00260-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SWINNEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 16, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • June 13, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.