U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00249-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Judgment 2255]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 04, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • September 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 21, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • September 10, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.