U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00248-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FOSTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 29, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice-Other]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.