U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MURPHY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Compassionate Release Motion to Reduce Sentence (2255)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • May 06, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 18, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice-Other]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 05, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • October 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.