U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00256-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SLADE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 14, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 03, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • August 24, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 24, 2021: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 29, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 29, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.