U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00247-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 08, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 13, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 05, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • August 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.