U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00255-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBINSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 23, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 06, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 05, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 05, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Arrest]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.