U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00254-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRINKLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Mailing Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2022: [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • August 26, 2022: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
  • August 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • July 15, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 14, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • November 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 24, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 20, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • September 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.