U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00251-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUTLER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • September 07, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • August 24, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 09, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 17, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • July 12, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • July 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 24, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • June 14, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
  • June 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • May 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • May 10, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • May 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 18, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 17, 2022: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 13, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 18, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 18, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 15, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 08, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 03, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 25, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 25, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • February 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • February 14, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 24, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 12, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motions Referred]
December, 2021
  • December 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • December 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Appearance Bond]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • November 16, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arrest]
  • November 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2021: [Waiver-Other]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Superseding Indictment]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 25, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 25, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • August 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 24, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 20, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • August 20, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.