U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCADDEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • May 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 05, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 24, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.