U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00258-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCLAIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 30, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 27, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 10, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 27, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.