U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00246-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 28, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.